Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Molegbe

Dioecesis Molegbensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 10 November 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Mbandaka-Bikoro
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Congo, The Democratic Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 79,000 (30,513 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Évêché, B.P. 74, Gbado-Lite, Equateur, Rep. Democratique du Congo; Procure Sainte Anne, B.P. 1800, Kinshasa Gombe, Rep Democratique du Congo
  • Telephone: (081)810.92.91; 720.41.28

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Ubanghi Belga {Belgian Ubanghi}
7 April 1911ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Ubanghi Belga {Belgian Ubanghi} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Ubanghi Belga {Belgian Ubanghi}
28 January 1935ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Ubanghi Belga {Belgian Ubanghi} Vicariate Apostolic of Ubanghi Belga {Belgian Ubanghi}
Diocese of Molegbe
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Ubanghi Belga {Belgian Ubanghi} Diocese of Molegbe

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Ubanghi Belga {Belgian Ubanghi}
195095,121500,00019.0%138392,4397732ap1951
Diocese of Molegbe
1970263,268600,00043.9%1155663,98873834ap1971
1980360,230877,00041.1%1048586,210688222ap1981
1990695,2281,148,94960.5%24386211,2131156021ap1991
19971,879,5663,761,73250.0%39226130,812326622ap2003
20132,148,0004,560,00047.1%42145638,357549023ap201

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_d, v3.0.5, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 20 Jan 2015