Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignace Matondo Kwa Nzambi, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Molegbe, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1932Born
2 Aug 196432.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
18 Nov 197442.5AppointedBishop of Basankusu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
13 Apr 197543.0Ordained BishopBishop of Basankusu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
27 Jun 199866.2AppointedBishop of Molegbe, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
23 May 200775.1RetiredBishop of Molegbe, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
9 Sep 201179.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Molegbe, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Ignace Matondo Kwa Nzambi
Bishop Ignace Matondo Kwa Nzambi C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Molegbe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYacamba

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 23 May 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115
  • d: L'Osservatore Romano (Italian), 9 Sep 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018