Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léon Théobald Delaere, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Molegbe, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1898Born
23 Sep 192325.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
13 Nov 195860.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ubanghi Belga {Belgian Ubanghi}, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
13 Nov 195860.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Fesseë
5 Apr 195961.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fesseë
10 Nov 195961.7AppointedBishop of Molegbe, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
3 Aug 196769.5ResignedBishop of Molegbe, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
3 Aug 196769.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusibisir
14 Sep 197678.6ResignedTitular Bishop of Rusibisir
14 Jun 198385.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Molegbe, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Léon Théobald Delaere
Bishop Léon Théobald Delaere O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Molegbe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGullegem, Belgium

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018