Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor Van Beurden, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kole


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1908BornPoppel, Belgium
25 Jul 193426.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
22 Jun 195143.4AppointedPrefect of Kole, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
14 Sep 196759.6AppointedBishop of Kole, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
11 Feb 196860.0Ordained BishopBishop of Kole, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
28 Jan 198072.0ResignedBishop of Kole, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
22 Apr 199183.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Kole, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Victor Van Beurden:
Bishop Victor Van Beurden SS.CC. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kole

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015