Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henricus Lamiroy

Deceased

Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1883BornHeurne
18 Dec 190926.3Ordained PriestPriest
6 Aug 192945.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
6 Aug 192945.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamus
14 Oct 192946.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamus
18 Dec 193148.3SucceededBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
10 May 195268.7DiedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Henricus Lamiroy:
Bishop Henricus Lamiroy (born , died ) Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013