Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Mayala ma Mpangu

Deceased

Bishop of Kisantu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1926Born
14 Jul 195731.3Ordained PriestPriest of Kisantu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
30 Aug 197145.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kisantu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
30 Aug 197145.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Flenucleta
21 Nov 197145.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Flenucleta
27 Apr 197347.1SucceededBishop of Kisantu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
31 Mar 199367.0DiedBishop of Kisantu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Antoine Mayala ma Mpangu
Bishop Antoine Mayala ma Mpangu (born , died ) Bishop of Kisantu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNselo

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast