Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Kembo Mamputu

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Matadi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1935BornMadimba-Kimfinda
23 Jun 196327.7Ordained PriestPriest of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
21 Jun 198852.7AppointedBishop of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
2 Oct 198853.0Ordained BishopBishop of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
21 Sep 201075.0RetiredBishop of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
26 Aug 201680.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Kembo Mamputu
Bishop Gabriel Kembo Mamputu (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Matadi

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,565
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126
  • d: CB, 8 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 9 Sep 2016