Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fidèle Nsielele Zi Mputu

Bishop of Kisantu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1950 Born
26 Sep 197626.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 199443.8AppointedBishop of Kisantu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
25 Sep 199444.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kisantu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Fidèle Nsielele Zi Mputu
Bishop Fidèle Nsielele Zi Mputu (born ) Bishop of Kisantu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKinshasa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kisantu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,479
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018