Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Matadi

Dioecesis Matadiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Daniel Nlandu Mayi, Bishop
  • Gabriel Kembo Mamputu, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 10 November 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kinshasa
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Congo, The Democratic Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 31,000 (11,973 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: B.P. 29, Matadi, Bas-Congo, Rep. Democratique du Congo
  • Telephone: 2125

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Matadi
1 July 1911ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Matadi (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Matadi
23 July 1930ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Matadi Vicariate Apostolic of Matadi
Diocese of Matadi
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Matadi Diocese of Matadi

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Matadi
1950133,039300,00044.3%1057671,9851078019ap1951
Diocese of Matadi
1969205,000560,00036.6%2755822,5008518831ap1971
1978400,000600,00066.7%3045755,333609837ap1981
1990626,0001,253,00050.0%4629758,3464313036ap1991
1999600,0001,400,00042.9%98191175,1282716637ap2000
2000650,0001,420,00045.8%121211424,5773416937ap2001
2001610,0001,450,00042.1%125211464,1783517237ap2002
2002620,0001,500,00041.3%120221424,3663617136ap2003
2003660,0001,700,00038.8%116281444,5834115137ap2004
2004665,0001,750,00038.0%124281524,3754115937ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Sep 2013