Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Timothée Bodika Mansiyai, P.S.S.

Auxiliary Bishop of Kinshasa

Titular Bishop of Naiera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1962 BornKinshasa
1 Aug 199028.6Ordained PriestPriest of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
1993²31.0ProfessedPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
2 Feb 201250.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
2 Feb 201250.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Naiera
15 Apr 201250.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Naiera

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Timothée Bodika Mansiyai:
Bishop Timothée Bodika Mansiyai P.S.S. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kinshasa

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Kinshasa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2012
  • ob: CB, 16 Feb 2012
  • c2: CB, 1 Mar 2012
  • c34: CB, 15 Apr 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,421

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013