Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Moko Ekanga, P.S.S.

Bishop of Idiofa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1958 BornKinshasa
1 Aug 198628.0Ordained PriestPriest of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
26 May 200950.9AppointedBishop of Idiofa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
15 Aug 200951.1Ordained BishopBishop of Idiofa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for José Moko Ekanga:
Bishop José Moko Ekanga P.S.S. (born ) Bishop of Idiofa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Idiofa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 May 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,258

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 22 Nov 2013