Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Marie Fansaka Biniama

Bishop of Popokabaka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1959 Born
21 Feb 198828.6Ordained PriestPriest of Kenge, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
29 Jun 202061.0AppointedBishop of Popokabaka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
23 Aug 202061.1Ordained BishopBishop of Popokabaka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Bernard Marie Fansaka Biniama
Bishop Bernard Marie Fansaka Biniama (born ) Bishop of Popokabaka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMisay, Prefecture Apostolic of Kenge
Ordained BishopOutdoors, near, Cathedral, Popokabaka, Diocese of Popokabaka

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Popokabaka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2020
  • ob: CB, 27 Jul 2020
  • c2: CB, 16 Aug 2020
  • c3+: CB, 23 Aug 2020
  • c4: CB, 24 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 26 Aug 2020

Quantcast