Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sylvain van Hee, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Koango o Kwango

Titular Bishop of Possala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1875BornMouscron, Belgium
28 Mar 192853.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Koango o Kwango, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
28 Mar 192853.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Possala
9 Sep 192853.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Possala
20 Feb 193661.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Koango o Kwango, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
26 Mar 196085.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Koango o Kwango, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Sylvain van Hee:
Bishop Sylvain van Hee S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Koango o Kwango

  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013