Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camille Lembi Zaneli (Zanelli)

Deceased

Bishop of Isangi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1950BornZongo
30 Sep 197929.5Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jun 200050.2AppointedBishop of Isangi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
26 Nov 200050.6Ordained BishopBishop of Isangi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
8 Jul 201161.3DiedBishop of Isangi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Camille Lembi Zaneli (Zanelli):
Bishop Camille Lembi Zaneli (Zanelli) (born , died ) Bishop of Isangi

  • a priest for 31.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 9 Jul 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Number 13,861

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013