Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Leo Dérikx, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Western Uélé {Uélé Occidental}, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1860Born
20 Dec 188424.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
191251.4AppointedPrefect of Western Uélé {Uélé Occidental}, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
192463.4ResignedPrefect of Western Uélé {Uélé Occidental}, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
21 Dec 193373.4DiedPrefect Emeritus of Western Uélé {Uélé Occidental}, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Leo Dérikx (VIAF: 89046168)
Father Leo Dérikx O. Praem. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Western Uélé {Uélé Occidental}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeerpelt
Death PlaceAntwerpen

  • a priest for 49.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast