Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges Désiré Raeymaeckers, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Bishop of Buta, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1899Born
1 Nov 192425.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
4 Feb 195354.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Buta, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
4 Feb 195354.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Mariamme
26 May 195354.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mariamme
10 Nov 195960.8AppointedBishop of Buta, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
10 Oct 196061.7DiedBishop of Buta, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Georges Désiré Raeymaeckers
Bishop Georges Désiré Raeymaeckers O. Praem. (born , died ) Bishop of Buta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGheel, Belgium

  • a priest for 35.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018