Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Marco Kur Adwok

Auxiliary Bishop of Khartoum, Sudan

Titular Bishop of Moxori


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1952 Born
29 May 197724.5Ordained PriestPriest
6 Oct 199239.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Khartoum, Sudan
6 Oct 199239.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Moxori
19 Feb 199340.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Moxori

MicroData Summary for Daniel Marco Kur Adwok
Bishop Daniel Marco Kur Adwok (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Khartoum

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAtar

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Khartoum.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,056

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018