Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paulino Lukudu Loro, F.S.C.J.

Archbishop Emeritus of Juba, South Sudan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1940 Born
12 Apr 197029.6Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
12 Dec 197434.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of El Obeid, Sudan
5 Mar 197938.5AppointedBishop of El Obeid, Sudan
27 May 197938.7Ordained BishopBishop of El Obeid, Sudan
19 Feb 198342.4AppointedArchbishop of Juba, South Sudan
12 Dec 201979.3RetiredArchbishop of Juba, South Sudan

MicroData Summary for Paulino Lukudu Loro
Archbishop Paulino Lukudu Loro F.S.C.J. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Juba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKwerijik
Ordained PriestVerona, Diocese of Verona, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Juba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2019
  • c1: CB, 11 Apr 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Number 3,912

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 21 Sep 2020

Quantcast