Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Nyodho Ador Majwok

Bishop of Malakal, South Sudan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1973 Born
14 Nov 200431.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Malakal, South Sudan
15 May 200532.3Ordained PriestPriest of Malakal, South Sudan
23 May 201946.3AppointedBishop of Malakal, South Sudan
28 Jul 201946.5Ordained BishopBishop of Malakal, South Sudan

MicroData Summary for Stephen Nyodho Ador Majwok
Bishop Stephen Nyodho Ador Majwok (born ) Bishop of Malakal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAndong, Diocese of Malakal
Ordained DeaconMalakal, Diocese of Malakal
Ordained BishopGrounds of, Christ the King, Cathedral, Malakal, Diocese of Malakal

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Malakal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 May 2019
  • od/c1: CB, 26 May 2019
  • ob: CB, 14 Jun 2019
  • c2: CB, 25 Jul 2019
  • c34: CB, 28 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 31 Jul 2019

Quantcast