Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hubertus Matheus Maria van Megen

Apostolic Nuncio to Kenya

Titular Archbishop of Novaliciana

Permanent Observer to United Nations Environment Program and Human Settlements Program

Apostolic Nuncio to South Sudan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1961 Born
13 Jun 198725.6Ordained PriestPriest of Roermond, Netherlands
8 Mar 201452.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sudan
8 Mar 201452.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Novaliciana
17 May 201452.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Novaliciana
7 Jun 201452.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Eritrea
16 Feb 201957.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Kenya
19 Mar 201957.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to South Sudan
25 May 201957.6AppointedPermanent Observer to United Nations Environment Program and Human Settlements Program

MicroData Summary for Hubertus Matheus Maria van Megen (VIAF: 309903130)
Archbishop Hubertus Matheus Maria van Megen (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Kenya

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEygelshoven
Ordained BishopSaint Christophe, Cathedral, Roermond, Diocese of Roermond, Netherlands

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Kenya.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 28 Mar 2014
  • c34: CB, 9 May 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Jun 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,160
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Feb 2019
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 25 May 2019

Quantcast