Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Maluki Mwongela

Bishop of Kitui, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1968 Born
7 Sep 199628.4Ordained PriestPriest of Kitui, Kenya
17 Mar 202051.9AppointedBishop of Kitui, Kenya
29 Aug 202052.3Ordained BishopBishop of Kitui, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Joseph Maluki Mwongela
Bishop Joseph Maluki Mwongela (born ) Bishop of Kitui

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKakumi, Diocese of Kitui
Ordained BishopGrounds of, St. Charles Lwanga School, Kitui, Diocese of Kitui

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kitui.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Mar 2020
  • ob: CB, 6 Jul 2020
  • ob: CB, 30 Jul 2020
  • c2+: CB, 26 Aug 2020
  • mn: CB, 29 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 29 Aug 2020

Quantcast