Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anthony Muheria

Archbishop of Nyeri, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1963 Born
13 Jun 199330.0Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
30 Oct 200340.4AppointedBishop of Embu, Kenya
10 Jan 200440.6Ordained BishopBishop of Embu, Kenya
28 Jun 200845.0AppointedBishop of Kitui, Kenya
21 Feb 201551.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Machakos, Kenya
23 Apr 201753.9AppointedArchbishop of Nyeri, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Anthony Muheria
Archbishop Anthony Muheria (born ) Archbishop of Nyeri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKaburugi

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Nyeri.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,505
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2008
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Apr 2017
  • aadm: CB, 23 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Apr 2017