Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Cornelius Otieno Odiwa

Bishop of Homa Bay, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1962 Born
3 Jul 199330.6Ordained PriestPriest of Kisii, Kenya
18 Oct 199330.9IncardinatedPriest of Homa Bay, Kenya
29 Nov 202058.0AppointedBishop of Homa Bay, Kenya
9 Feb 202158.2Ordained BishopBishop of Homa Bay, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Michael Cornelius Otieno Odiwa
Bishop Michael Cornelius Otieno Odiwa (born ) Bishop of Homa Bay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSori Karungu, Diocese of Kisii
Ordained BishopGrounds of, Homa Bay High School, Homa Bay, Diocese of Homa Bay

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Homa Bay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Nov 2020
  • ob: AM, 17 Jan 2021
  • c2: CB, 6 Feb 2021
  • mn: CB, 8 Feb 2021
  • c34: CB, 9 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Feb 2021

Quantcast