Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Akio Johnson Mutek

Deceased

Bishop of Torit, South Sudan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1958Born
18 Dec 198830.9Ordained PriestPriest of Torit, South Sudan
18 May 199941.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Torit, South Sudan
18 May 199941.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Suava
15 Aug 199941.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Suava
9 Jun 200749.4AppointedBishop of Torit, South Sudan
18 Mar 201355.2DiedBishop of Torit, South Sudan

MicroData Summary for Akio Johnson Mutek
Bishop Akio Johnson Mutek (born , died ) Bishop of Torit

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLodwara Tala

  • a priest for 24.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,596
  • d: CB, 18 Mar 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018