Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Hiiboro Kussala

Bishop of Tombura-Yambio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1964 BornSource Yubu
20 May 199430.2Ordained PriestPriest of Tombura-Yambio, South Sudan
19 Apr 200844.1AppointedBishop of Tombura-Yambio, South Sudan
29 Jun 200844.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tombura-Yambio, South Sudan

MicroData Summary for Edward Hiiboro Kussala:
Bishop Edward Hiiboro Kussala (born ) Bishop of Tombura-Yambio

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tombura-Yambio.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,772

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 24 Dec 2013