Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Abangite Gasi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tombura-Yambio, South Sudan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1928Born
21 Dec 195729.9Ordained PriestPriest of Mupoi, Sudan
12 Dec 197446.9AppointedBishop of Tombura, Sudan
6 Apr 197547.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tombura, Sudan
19 Apr 200880.2RetiredBishop of Tombura-Yambio, South Sudan
12 Sep 201486.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Tombura-Yambio, South Sudan

MicroData Summary for Joseph Abangite Gasi
Bishop Joseph Abangite Gasi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tombura-Yambio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMupoi

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 39.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • d: CB, 13 Sep 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast