Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Santo Loku Pio Doggale

Auxiliary Bishop of Juba

Titular Bishop of Equizetum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1969 BornKatiré
7 Jan 200131.0Ordained PriestPriest of Juba, South Sudan
27 Nov 201040.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Juba, South Sudan
27 Nov 201040.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Equizetum
20 Feb 201141.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Equizetum

MicroData Summary for Santo Loku Pio Doggale:
Bishop Santo Loku Pio Doggale (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Juba

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Juba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Nov 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,955

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 24 Dec 2013