Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Erkolano Lodu Tombe

Bishop of Yei, South Sudan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1943 Born
17 May 197027.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 198642.9AppointedBishop of Yei, South Sudan
28 Nov 198643.5Ordained BishopBishop of Yei, South Sudan

MicroData Summary for Erkolano Lodu Tombe
Bishop Erkolano Lodu Tombe (born ) Bishop of Yei

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBilinyang

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Yei.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,249
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018