Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of N’Djaména

Archidioecesis Ndiamenanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 15 October 1973
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Chad
  • Square Kilometers: 620,100 (239,513 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: B.P. 456, N'Djamena, Tchad
  • Telephone: 51.74.44
  • Fax: 52.50.51

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Fort-Lamy
9 January 1947ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Berbérati
Vicariate Apostolic of Foumban
Vicariate Apostolic of Khartoum
Prefecture Apostolic of Fort-Lamy (erected)
17 May 1951Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Fort-Lamy
Prefecture Apostolic of Garoua
Prefecture Apostolic of Moundou (erected)
Diocese of Fort-Lamy
14 September 1955ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Fort-Lamy Diocese of Fort-Lamy
22 December 1961Territory LostDiocese of Fort-Lamy Diocese of Fort-Archambault (erected)
Archdiocese of Fort-Lamy
22 December 1961ElevatedDiocese of Fort-Lamy Archdiocese of Fort-Lamy
Archdiocese of N’Djaména
15 October 1973Name ChangedArchdiocese of Fort-Lamy Archdiocese of N’Djaména
1 December 2001Territory LostArchdiocese of N’Djaména
Diocese of Sarh
Prefecture Apostolic of Mongo (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Fort-Lamy
19501,8001,443,600.1%14141282326ap1951
Diocese of Fort-Lamy
Archdiocese of Fort-Lamy
197019,8011,600,0001.2%52227733354712ap1971
Archdiocese of N’Djaména
198024,8002,000,0001.2%429337511443110ap1981
199034,5002,422,0001.4%43135985414614ap1991
199970,0003,500,0002.0%2022421,666295823ap2000
200080,9163,500,0002.3%2426501,618336423ap2001
200177,4411,837,5854.2%2017372,093225923ap2002
200295,0001,837,5855.2%2323462,065327027ap2003
2003154,4952,650,0005.8%2622483,218296623ap2004
2004156,6082,650,0005.9%2120413,819327018ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 20 Nov 2013