Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Sarh

Dioecesis Sarhensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Edmond Djitangar, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 22 August 1972
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of N’Djaména
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Chad
  • Square Kilometers: 45,180 (17,450 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 87, Sarh, Tchad
  • Telephone: 2268.14.24
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Fort-Archambault
22 December 1961ErectedDiocese of Fort-Lamy Diocese of Fort-Archambault (erected)
Diocese of Sarh
22 August 1972Name ChangedDiocese of Fort-Archambault Diocese of Sarh
1 December 2001Territory LostArchdiocese of N’Djaména
Diocese of Sarh
Prefecture Apostolic of Mongo (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Fort-Archambault
197016,600400,0004.2%33336461443315ap1971
Diocese of Sarh
198025,000577,0004.3%33437675425425ap1981
198838,200654,0005.8%33942909496117ap1991
199946,477929,9225.0%1231431,080427017ap2000
200047,799922,9995.2%143448995445516ap2001
200147,478738,5956.4%1332451,055456015ap2002
200267,806747,7419.1%1824421,614397215ap2003
2003107,8001,051,78910.2%2130512,113517515ap2004
2004111,3001,078,13410.3%1930492,271416615ap2005
201098,8901,235,3708.0%2736631,569675917ap2011
2013141,5491,340,00010.6%1819373,825193317ap2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Oct 2014