Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Matthias N’Gartéri Mayadi

Deceased

Archbishop of N’Djaména


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1942BornBedaya
30 Dec 197837.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sarh, Chad
28 Oct 198543.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sarh, Chad
28 Oct 198543.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thuburnica
12 Apr 198644.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thuburnica
7 Mar 198745.2AppointedBishop of Sarh, Chad
11 Jun 199048.4AppointedBishop of Moundou, Chad
31 Jul 200361.6AppointedArchbishop of N’Djaména, Chad
19 Nov 201371.9DiedArchbishop of N’Djaména, Chad

MicroData Summary for Matthias N’Gartéri Mayadi:
Archbishop Matthias N’Gartéri Mayadi (died ) Archbishop of N’Djaména

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 20 Nov 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Oct 2014