Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Xavier Yombandje

Bishop Emeritus of Bossangoa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1956 BornKoumra
22 Sep 198529.2Ordained PriestPriest of Bangui, Central African Republic
28 Jun 199741.0AppointedBishop of Kaga-Bandoro, Central African Republic
26 Oct 199741.3Ordained BishopBishop of Kaga-Bandoro, Central African Republic
3 Apr 200447.7AppointedBishop of Bossangoa, Central African Republic
16 May 200952.9ResignedBishop of Bossangoa, Central African Republic

MicroData Summary for François-Xavier Yombandje:
Bishop François-Xavier Yombandje (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Bossangoa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bossangoa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 May 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,163

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013