Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Moundou

Dioecesis Munduensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 19 February 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of N’Djaména
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Chad
  • Square Kilometers: 8,692 (3,357 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: B.P. 61, Moundou, Tchad
  • Telephone: 69.13.70
  • Fax: 69.13.78

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Moundou
17 May 1951ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Fort-Lamy
Prefecture Apostolic of Garoua
Prefecture Apostolic of Moundou (erected)
Diocese of Moundou
19 February 1959ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Moundou Diocese of Moundou
6 March 1989Territory LostDiocese of Moundou Diocese of Doba (erected)
28 November 1998Territory LostDiocese of Doba
Diocese of Moundou
Diocese of Goré (erected)
28 November 1998Territory LostDiocese of Doba
Diocese of Moundou
Diocese of Lai (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Moundou
1970110,456725,09515.2%645512,165564422ap1971
1980168,537895,00018.8%551563,0096472ap1981
1990155,732784,47619.9%932413,798435120ap1991
1999120,022455,48926.4%2315383,158164519ap2000
2000246,083455,48954.0%2311347,237135012ap2001
2001173,280455,48938.0%1411256,931134312ap2002
2002173,819455,48938.2%166227,90075012ap2003
2003179,115533,08933.6%285335,42766812ap2004
2004182,895533,08934.3%295345,37966212ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 20 Nov 2013