Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Garoua

Archidioecesis Garuensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Antoine Ntalou, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 18 March 1982
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Cameroon
  • Square Kilometers: 65,234 (25,196 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://diocesegaroua.e-monsite.com/
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, B.P. 272, Garoua, Cameroun
  • Telephone: 2271.353
  • Fax: 2272.942

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Garoua
9 January 1947ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Foumban Prefecture Apostolic of Garoua (erected)
17 May 1951Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Fort-Lamy
Prefecture Apostolic of Garoua
Prefecture Apostolic of Moundou (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Garoua
24 March 1953ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Garoua Vicariate Apostolic of Garoua
Diocese of Garoua
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Garoua Diocese of Garoua
19 December 1956Territory LostDiocese of Garoua Prefecture Apostolic of Pala (erected)
11 March 1968Territory LostDiocese of Garoua Prefecture Apostolic of Maroua-Mokolo (erected)
11 March 1968Territory LostDiocese of Garoua Prefecture Apostolic of Yagoua (erected)
Archdiocese of Garoua
18 March 1982ElevatedDiocese of Garoua Archdiocese of Garoua
19 November 1982Territory LostArchdiocese of Garoua Diocese of Ngaoundéré (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Garoua
19501,5001,200,000.1%272755810ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Garoua
Diocese of Garoua
197014,395551,4312.6%546512825341ap1971
198038,238858,0004.5%363665791707332ap1981
Archdiocese of Garoua
199056,267630,0008.9%1145561,004505619ap1991
199977,6521,100,0007.1%1836541,438428321ap2000
200080,8051,100,0007.3%1836541,496418521ap2001
200189,2871,100,0008.1%2035551,623399121ap2002
200290,2651,100,0008.2%2151721,2535410021ap2003
200393,1951,129,8748.2%2129501,8633510121ap2004
200487,8841,122,6607.8%2426501,757368921ap2005
200692,4001,135,0728.1%3524591,566349522ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013