Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Christian Wiyghan Cardinal Tumi

Archbishop Emeritus of Douala

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Martiri dell’Uganda a Poggio Ameno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1930 BornKikaikelaki
17 Apr 196635.5Ordained PriestPriest
6 Dec 197949.1AppointedBishop of Yagoua, Cameroon
6 Jan 198049.2Ordained BishopBishop of Yagoua, Cameroon
19 Nov 198252.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Garoua, Cameroon
17 Mar 198453.4SucceededArchbishop of Garoua, Cameroon
28 Jun 198857.7Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 198857.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Martiri dell’Uganda a Poggio Ameno
31 Aug 199160.9AppointedArchbishop of Douala, Cameroon
17 Nov 200979.1RetiredArchbishop of Douala, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Christian Wiyghan Tumi:
Christian Wiyghan Cardinal Tumi (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Douala

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Douala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Nov 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 25 Jan 2014