Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Bosco Ntep

Bishop of Edéa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1951 BornHikoamaen
25 Mar 197928.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 199342.0AppointedBishop of Eséka, Cameroon
4 Jul 199342.3Ordained BishopBishop of Eséka, Cameroon
15 Oct 200453.5AppointedBishop of Edéa, Cameroon
4 Dec 200453.7InstalledBishop of Edéa, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Jean-Bosco Ntep:
Bishop Jean-Bosco Ntep (born ) Bishop of Edéa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Edéa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,158
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013