Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Simon Tonyé

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Douala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1922BornLog-Mbon-Bikok
15 Aug 195533.2Ordained PriestPriest of Douala, Cameroon
12 Dec 196947.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Douala, Cameroon
12 Dec 196947.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamascani
1 Feb 197047.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamascani
29 Aug 197351.2SucceededBishop of Douala, Cameroon
18 Mar 198259.8AppointedArchbishop of Douala, Cameroon
31 Aug 199169.2ResignedArchbishop of Douala, Cameroon
21 Feb 199774.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Douala, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Simon Tonyé:
Archbishop Simon Tonyé (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Douala

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015