Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Célestin Nkou

Deceased

Bishop of Sangmélima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1927BornEdéa
15 Apr 195628.4Ordained PriestPriest of Douala, Cameroon
18 Jan 196335.1AppointedBishop of Sangmélima, Cameroon
2 Jun 196335.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sangmélima, Cameroon
16 May 198355.5DiedBishop of Sangmélima, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Célestin Nkou:
Bishop Pierre-Célestin Nkou (born , died ) Bishop of Sangmélima

  • a priest for 27.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015