Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Joseph François de Bernon, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Maroua-Mokolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1927BornBoulogne-sur-Mer, France
12 Jul 195224.9Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
11 Mar 196840.6AppointedPrefect of Maroua-Mokolo, Cameroon
29 Jan 197345.5AppointedBishop of Maroua-Mokolo, Cameroon
1 Jul 197345.9Ordained BishopBishop of Maroua-Mokolo, Cameroon
22 Sep 199467.1DiedBishop of Maroua-Mokolo, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Jacques Joseph François de Bernon:
Bishop Jacques Joseph François de Bernon O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Maroua-Mokolo

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015