Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Yves-Joseph-Marie Plumey, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Garoua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1913BornVannes, France
29 Jun 193724.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
25 Mar 194734.2AppointedPrefect of Garoua, Cameroon
24 Mar 195340.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Doliche
24 Mar 195340.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Garoua, Cameroon
29 Jun 195340.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Doliche
14 Sep 195542.6AppointedBishop of Garoua, Cameroon
18 Mar 198269.1AppointedArchbishop of Garoua, Cameroon
17 Mar 198471.1ResignedArchbishop of Garoua, Cameroon
3 Sep 199178.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Garoua, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Yves-Joseph-Marie Plumey:
Archbishop Yves-Joseph-Marie Plumey O.M.I. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Garoua

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 38.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013