Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Armand-Albert-Lucien Fallaize, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mackenzie, Northwest Territories

Titular Bishop of Thmuis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1887BornGonneville-sur-Honfleur, France
11 Jul 191225.1Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
23 Jun 193144.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Mackenzie, Northwest Territories, Canada
23 Jun 193144.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thmuis
13 Sep 193144.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thmuis
1939²51.6ResignedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Mackenzie, Northwest Territories, Canada
10 Aug 196477.2DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mackenzie, Northwest Territories, Canada

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Armand-Albert-Lucien Fallaize:
Bishop Pierre-Armand-Albert-Lucien Fallaize O.M.I. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mackenzie

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015