Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ovide Charlebois, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Keewatin, Manitoba

Titular Bishop of Berenice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1862BornOka
17 Jul 188725.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
8 Aug 191048.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Keewatin, Manitoba, Canada
8 Aug 191048.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Berenice
30 Nov 191048.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Berenice
7 Mar 191149.1InstalledVicar Apostolic of Keewatin, Manitoba, Canada
20 Nov 193371.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Keewatin, Manitoba, Canada

MicroData Summary for Ovide Charlebois:
Bishop Ovide Charlebois O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Keewatin

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 84
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013