Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alexandre Antonin Taché, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1823Born
12 Oct 184522.2Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
14 Jun 185026.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada
14 Jun 185026.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Arathia
23 Nov 185128.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arathia
7 Jun 185329.8SucceededBishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada
22 Sep 187148.1AppointedArchbishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada
21 Jun 189470.9DiedArchbishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada

MicroData Summary for Alexandre Antonin Taché (VIAF: 49351786)
Archbishop Alexandre Antonin Taché O.M.I. (born , died ) Archbishop of Saint-Boniface

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Patrice de la Rivière-du-Loup, Archdiocese of Québec
Ordained BishopCathedral, Viviers, Diocese of Viviers, France

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 42.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 115, and Page 152
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Feb 2017