Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidore Clut, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Athabaska Mackenzie, Alberta, Canada

Titular Bishop of Arindela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1832Born
20 Dec 185725.8Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
3 Aug 186432.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Athabaska Mackenzie, Alberta, Canada
3 Aug 186432.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Arindela
15 Aug 186533.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arindela
26 Sep 189058.6ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Athabaska Mackenzie, Alberta, Canada
9 Jul 190371.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Athabaska Mackenzie, Alberta, Canada

MicroData Summary for Isidore Clut (VIAF: 50851088)
Bishop Isidore Clut O.M.I. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Athabaska Mackenzie

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Rambert-d'Albon, France
Ordained BishopAthabaska, Vicariate Apostolic of Athabaska Mackenzie, Alberta

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 37.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 122
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1867, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Feb 2017