Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Grouard-McLennan

Archidioecesis Gruardensis-McLennanpolitanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Gérard Pettipas, C.SS.R., Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 13 July 1967
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Alberta
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 224,596 (86,750 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: West (Ouest)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: Grou
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, 210 1ere rue ouest, C.P. 388, McLennan, AB T0H 2L0, Canada
  • Telephone: (780)324-3002
  • Fax: 324-3952

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Athabaska Mackenzie
8 April 1862ErectedDiocese of Saint-Boniface Vicariate Apostolic of Athabaska Mackenzie (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Athabaska
3 July 1901SplitVicariate Apostolic of Athabaska Mackenzie Vicariate Apostolic of Athabaska
Vicariate Apostolic of Mackenzie
Vicariate Apostolic of Grouard
15 March 1927Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Athabaska Vicariate Apostolic of Grouard
Archdiocese of Grouard-McLennan
13 July 1967ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Grouard Archdiocese of Grouard-McLennan (Name Changed and Vicariate raised to an Archdiocese)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Grouard
195024,67350,00049.3%862703529722235ap1951
196630,19476,88439.3%1263754029122341ap1967
Archdiocese of Grouard-McLennan
196832,98388,34437.3%757645157420539ap1971
197630,00088,00034.1%444486255210041ap1977
198030,90096,70032.0%54449630548142ap1981
199035,90097,70036.7%328311,1581315262ap1991
199944,397123,15536.0%516212,1141172529ap2000
200042,675108,92639.2%618241,7781182369ap2001
200143,264116,53037.1%416202,1632162067ap2002
200243,608116,53037.4%221231,8962211967ap2003
200343,686112,01939.0%520251,7472202267ap2004
200444,470114,76038.8%718251,7781181968ap2005
200647,899112,98642.4%718251,9152212567ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 29 Jun 2013