Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ubald Langlois, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Grouard, Alberta

Titular Bishop of Risinium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1887BornBourget
6 Jun 191427.3Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
30 Mar 193851.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Grouard, Alberta, Canada
30 Mar 193851.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Risinium
20 Jun 193851.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Risinium
18 Sep 195366.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Grouard, Alberta, Canada

MicroData Summary for Ubald Langlois:
Bishop Ubald Langlois O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Grouard

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015