Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Marie Trocellier, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Mackenzie, Northwest Territory

Titular Bishop of Adramyttium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1888BornTuzet (Javols), France
25 May 192031.6Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
26 Jun 194051.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Mackenzie, Northwest Territory, Canada
26 Jun 194051.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
8 Sep 194051.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
6 Apr 194354.4SucceededVicar Apostolic of Mackenzie, Northwest Territory, Canada
27 Nov 195870.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Mackenzie, Northwest Territory, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Marie Trocellier:
Bishop Joseph-Marie Trocellier O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Mackenzie

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013