Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anthony Jordan, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1901Born
17 Aug 192119.7EnteredMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
20 Aug 192220.7First VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
2 Aug 192624.7Perpetual VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
23 Jun 192927.6Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
22 Jun 194543.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Prince Rupert, British Columbia, Canada
22 Jun 194543.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Vada
8 Sep 194543.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vada
17 Apr 195553.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada
17 Apr 195553.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Silyum
11 Aug 196462.7SucceededArchbishop of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada
2 Jul 197371.6ResignedArchbishop of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada
4 Mar 198280.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada

MicroData Summary for Anthony Jordan
Archbishop Anthony Jordan O.M.I. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Edmonton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBroxburn, Great Britain
Ordained PriestLebret
Ordained BishopSt-Albert
Death PlaceEdmonton, Archdiocese of Edmonton, Alberta

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 49
  • c1/prof/loc: CB, 12 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 13 Apr 2019

Quantcast