Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hubert Patrick O’Connor, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Prince George, British Columbia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1928BornHuntingdon
5 Jun 195426.3Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
15 Oct 197143.7AppointedBishop of Whitehorse, Yukon, Canada
8 Dec 197143.8Ordained BishopBishop of Whitehorse, Yukon, Canada
17 Dec 197143.8InstalledBishop of Whitehorse, Yukon, Canada
9 Jun 198658.3AppointedBishop of Prince George, British Columbia, Canada
15 Aug 198658.5InstalledBishop of Prince George, British Columbia, Canada
8 Jul 199163.4ResignedBishop of Prince George, British Columbia, Canada
24 Jul 200779.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Prince George, British Columbia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Hubert Patrick O’Connor:
Bishop Hubert Patrick O’Connor O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Prince George

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013