Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Whitehorse

Dioecesis Equialbensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 13 July 1967
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Grouard-McLennan
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Yukon
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 723,515 (279,457 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: West (Ouest)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: Wh
  • Official Web Site: http://www.whitehorsediocese.com/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, 406 Steele St., Whitehorse, Yukon Y1A 2C8 Canada
  • Telephone: (867)668-3826
  • Fax: 667-4713

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Yukon-Prince Rupert
9 March 1908ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Mackenzie Prefecture Apostolic of Yukon-Prince Rupert (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Yukon-Prince Rupert
20 November 1916ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Yukon-Prince Rupert Vicariate Apostolic of Yukon-Prince Rupert
14 January 1944SplitVicariate Apostolic of Yukon-Prince Rupert Vicariate Apostolic of Prince Rupert
Vicariate Apostolic of Whitehorse
Vicariate Apostolic of Whitehorse
14 January 1944SplitVicariate Apostolic of Yukon-Prince Rupert Vicariate Apostolic of Prince Rupert
Vicariate Apostolic of Whitehorse
Diocese of Whitehorse
13 July 1967ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Whitehorse Diocese of Whitehorse

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Whitehorse
19502,1179,36122.6%1232488251731ap1951
19665,68017,32832.8%12324236271642ap1967
Diocese of Whitehorse
19705,90017,00034.7%2222268272128ap1971
19766,50024,50026.5%212130924132ap1977
19807,43031,51823.6%181841221162ap1981
19907,55937,31820.3%2141647216819ap1991
199914,13544,21332.0%39121,177211726ap2000
200011,28736,39531.0%31013868112724ap2001
200113,43036,50136.8%39121,119110824ap2002
200211,47236,61731.3%3912956110826ap2004
20039,17535,61425.8%4913705110823ap2005
20109,30042,15022.1%56118456419ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Aug 2014